THE SJL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance such charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) for the benefit of the public, as the trustees see fit from time to time, in particular, but not limited to making grants to charities, or other organisations working to advance charitable purpose.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Lancaster | Chair | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Glen McKechnie | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Lancaster | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kate Hanson | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karl Evans | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/12/2020 | 13/12/2021 | 13/12/2022 | 13/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.68k | £6.58k | £54.22k | £49.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.10k | £8.00k | £45.46k | £49.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jun 2019 as amended on 16 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO MAKING GRANTS TO CHARITIES, INDIVIDUALS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO ADVANCE CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Kays Building
23 The Tything
Worcester
WR1 1HD
- Phone:
- 0190527775
- Email:
- foundation@sjlins.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window