THE HOPKINS COSTUME TRUST CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We assist the academic study and research of the subject of historical dress, using the Hopkins Costume Collection as a basis. The collection is made available to students and historians of the subject, as well as documentary makers and costumer designers for film, television, and theatre. We also lend out parts of the collection to museums, to be exhibited for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Grace | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL ANGUS HOPKINS | Trustee | 16 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALAN HOPKINS | Trustee | 16 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
SEBASTIEN DANIEL PASSOT | Trustee | 16 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH SARAH HUMPHREY | Trustee | 16 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA MENZIES HOPKINS | Trustee | 16 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £1.10k | £4.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £600 | £3.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF HISTORICAL DRESS AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE DISSEMINATED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS PURPOSE THE TRUSTEES SHALL: A) MAKE AVAILABLE PART OR ALL OF THE HOPKINS COLLECTION OF HISTORICAL DRESS TO STUDENTS OF THE SUBJECT, FILM, TELEVISION AND DOCUMENTARY MAKERS AND EDITORS OF BOOKS ON SUBJECT FOR THE GREATER PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF HISTORICAL DRESS ; B) PROVIDE PUBLIC ACCESS TO THE HOPKINS COLLECTION BY INVITATION, APPLICATION OR BY ACCESS TO A MUSEUM; C) LEND (AT NO CHARGE) TO MUSEUMS ITEMS FROM THE HOPKINS COLLECTION IN RESPECT OF HISTORICAL DRESS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND PUBLIC VIEW.
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 STREATHBOURNE ROAD
LONDON
SW17 8QY
- Phone:
- 02086725140
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window