Accounts and annual returns VOLUNTEER GLOBAL HEALTH

Charity number: 1185528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 03 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 03 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 03 August 2024 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 03 August 2024 180 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 06 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 09 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 09 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window