CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST EVERLASTING GLORY OF GOD PARISH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities of religious organisations. To advance the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the statements of belief appearing in the schedule.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FESTUS AKINTUNDE | Chair | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
OLABISI OMOTAYO AYEYE | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
ADEBOLA AWODOLA | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £320 | £560 | £2.65k | £11.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £770 | £858 | £1.93k | £10.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
81 NOEL STREET
LEICESTER
LE3 0DT
- Phone:
- 07466791791
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window