Accounts and annual returns AUNTIE VAL'S ABILITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1185557
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 03 January 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 October 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time