LAST CHANCE COVENTRY FERRET RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Last Chance Coventry Ferret Rescue promotes humane behaviour towards ferrets, providing them with a haven to provide appropriate care, treatment, rehabilitation and neutering. Once they are ready, we then find suitable homes to live the rest of their lives in. We also promote, and educate, the public in ferret welfare, husbandry and how they make ideal pets.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 15 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Willson Treasurer | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Bridgewater | Trustee | 29 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Moore | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Tomlinson | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA WILLSON | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.98k | £17.30k | £17.63k | £16.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.88k | £16.54k | £19.32k | £16.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2024 | 346 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2024 | 346 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, PARTICULARLY FERRETS, BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR FERRETS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO FERRET WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS, PARTICULARLY FERRETS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 TORCASTLE CLOSE
COVENTRY
CV6 5QH
- Phone:
- 07941641220
- Website:
-
lastchance_Rescue.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window