YOUNG PEOPLE'S COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE, PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £34,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 24 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LUKE BUTCHER | Chair | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Bonar | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Curtis Doyle | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Gardner | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Phillips | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Rand | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Williamson | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Weir | Trustee | 09 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Alison Graham | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Peter Ashworth | Trustee | 14 May 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.09k | £450.88k | £410.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.36k | £352.69k | £433.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £106.40k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.27k | N/A | £34.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Barrowden Road
Ketton
STAMFORD
Lincolnshire
PE9 3RJ
- Phone:
- 07740302107
- Email:
- admin@ypcs.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window