THE FRIENDS OF THE IPSWICH MUSEUMS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of the Ipswich Museums is an organisation which supports the work of the Ipswich Museum, Christchurch Mansion and the High Street Art Gallery. We help with grants for new museum acquisitions, conservation work, exhibitions and museum development. We hold talks, excursions and social events throughout the year to keep our membership involved in everything that we do.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 20 June 2019: CIO registration
- 18 September 2019: Funds received from 275527 THE FRIENDS OF THE IPSWICH MUSEUMS
- FOIM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD WILSON | Chair | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER STRANG | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA BROOKS | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ERICA BURROWS | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DENISE FIENNES | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|||||
ANDREW SEWELL | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ATTENBORROW | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.88k | £16.00k | £16.83k | £186.05k | £33.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.04k | £14.91k | £25.42k | £182.19k | £22.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING, SUPPORTING, ASSISTING AND IMPROVING THE IPSWICH MUSEUMS AND GALLERIES THROUGH THE ACTIVITY OF A GROUP OF FRIENDS WHICH WILL: (1) SUPPORT PRESERVATION, PRESENTATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE COLLECTIONS OF THE IPSWICH MUSEUMS AND GALLERIES IN CO-OPERATION WITH ITS MANAGEMENT AND STAFF; (2) PROMOTE AWARENESS OF AND STIMULATE INTEREST IN THE IPSWICH MUSEUMS AND GALLERIES WITHIN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ipswich Museum
High Street
IPSWICH
IP1 3QH
- Phone:
- 01473433554
- Email:
- contact@foim.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window