BANK VIEW HIGH SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational support to a specific school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 05 September 1983: Standard registration
- 14 April 2025: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
- THE MEADOW BANK HOME AND SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2017 | 30/03/2018 | 30/03/2019 | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.65k | £6.38k | £3.51k | £5.26k | £560 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.22k | £6.11k | £1.54k | £3.61k | £368 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 480 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 480 days | |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 845 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 845 days | |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUNE 1983 as amended on 22 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE MENTALLY AND PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN WHO ATTEND MEADOW BANK SPECIAL SCHOOL, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window