THE SIR ANTHONY WHARTON RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The development of rugby union football amongst young people in the counties of Nottinghamshire Lincolnshire and Derbyshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 19 July 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN ROBERT INGLIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Miles Hallam | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Taylor | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Leonard Spencer | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW OSMOND | Trustee | 26 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MOLYNEUX | Trustee | 26 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.11k | £17.82k | £11.68k | £6.60k | £7.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.00k | £16.47k | £14.80k | £7.49k | £12.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 JUNE 1983
Charitable objects
(A) TO ORGANISE OR PROVIDE OR TO ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO ENCOURAGE AND ENABLE BOYS AT SCHOOL (AND COLLEGES OR IN FURTHER EDUCATION) TO PLAY RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL AND THEREBY TO PROMOTE THEIR PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT. (B) TO ORGANISE OR PROVIDE OR TO ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR BOYS AND YOUNG MEN UNDER THE AGE OF TWENTY THREE YEARS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES TO PLAY RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE TRUST DEED)
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE DERBYSHIRE AND LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Jumelles Drive
Calverton
Nottingham
NG14 6QD
- Phone:
- 07921922172
- Email:
- panda.molyneux@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window