THE OLI HILSDON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds from individuals and corporations to fund brain tumour research, in particular through sponsored events and the OHF's annual Gala Dinner. The development and operation of the OHF's website to act as a fundraising platform and a platform for spreading awareness about brain tumours and Glioblastoma Multiforme
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 April 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgia Perry-Hilsdon | Chair | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maria Perry BA | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adam Lee | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emily Hilsdon BSc | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Boreham M.A, MPhil | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Robert McWilliams | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £706.07k | £110.05k | £154.26k | £580.24k | £155.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £279.74k | £344.45k | £361.52k | £660.60k | £4.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £706.07k | N/A | N/A | £579.14k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £74.16k | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £1.10k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £208.54k | N/A | N/A | £591.44k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £71.20k | N/A | N/A | £68.06k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | £591.44k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £1.10k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING AND THE PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH BRAIN TUMOURS, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION THROUGH SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, EFFECTS AND CONSEQUENCES OF BRAIN TUMOURS (INCLUDING SURVIVAL EXTENSION AND CURATIVE TREATMENTS).
Contact information
- Address:
-
BITTLESEA FARM
BRADENSTOKE
CHIPPENHAM
SN15 4EW
- Phone:
- 07927483761
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window