Accounts and annual returns HORWICH BREAKAWAY CLUB

Charity number: 514067
Charity reporting is overdue by 1499 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
Accounts and TAR 04 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
Annual return 04 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 403 days
Accounts and TAR 04 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 403 days
Annual return 04 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 769 days
Accounts and TAR 04 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 769 days
Annual return 04 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1134 days
Accounts and TAR 04 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1134 days
Annual return 04 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1499 days
Accounts and TAR 04 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1499 days