COMHALTAS IN BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Comhaltas in Britain is a creative community nurturing Irish culture. We promote and pass on our Irish cultural traditions to future generations. As a voluntary membership organisation we provide education opportunities to young people, social activities for families and support against isolation for later in life through a connection to traditional Irish music, song, dance & the Irish language.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £106,991 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
280 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Theresa Concepta Gallagher | Chair | 17 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Peter Fitzgerald | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mairi Claire Docherty | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Calum McGregor | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Ross Browne | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Evin Francis Downey | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Joseph Ballantyne | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £378.71k | £149.11k | £142.27k | £153.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.82k | £179.24k | £170.52k | £166.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £106.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN TRADITIONAL IRISH MUSICAL ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BY PRESENTING PERFORMANCES OF, AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE PUBLIC TO PARTICIPATE IN, TRADITIONAL FORMS OF IRISH MUSIC, DANCING AND SINGING INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) TRADITIONAL IRISH DANCING, THE PLAYING OF THE HARP AND UILLEANN PIPES, AND TRADITIONAL SONG IN THE IRISH LANGUAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Liverpool Irish Centre
6 BOUNDARY LANE
EVERTON
LIVERPOOL
L6 5JG
- Phone:
- 07708949919
- Email:
- info@comhaltas.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window