THE CAMBRIDGE RUSSIAN-SPEAKING SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education for the public benefit in East Anglia by providing opportunities for members of the public to learn the Russian language and to engage in activities and events designed to enable them to develop a better understanding of the history, arts and culture of Russia.CamRuSS is an apolitical organisation and works without bias or taking political stances to achieve the objects stated
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £53,706 from 3 government contract(s) and £12,432 from 4 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 29 May 2019: CIO registration
- CAMRUSS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sayana Thompson | Chair | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Olga Starobinskaya | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrei Bejan | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Alla Viktorova | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Argunova | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Olga Tutubalina | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sayana Namsaraeva | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr KSENIA AFONINA | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ekaterina Onatskaia | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.65k | £14.91k | £19.56k | £32.80k | £88.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.90k | £5.53k | £8.42k | £27.43k | £76.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £53.71k | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.99k | £500 | N/A | £20.25k | £12.43k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 December 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 29 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN EAST ANGLIA BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO LEARN THE RUSSIAN LANGUAGE AND TO ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS DESIGNED TO ENABLE THEM TO DEVELOP A BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF THE HISTORY, ARTS AND CULTURE OF RUSSIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33
Church Street
Cambridge
Cambridgeshire
UK
CB4 1DT
- Phone:
- 01223701016
- Email:
- camruss@camruss.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window