MEMORIAL INSTITUTE, SANDIACRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community centre providing facilities for groups and organisations such as, Polling station, Pre-school certified by OFSTED, dance classes, Exercise and fitness classes and also casual users for parties and meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 18 July 1983: Standard registration
- SANDIACRE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Wayne Major | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Stewart | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stewart | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Dickman | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BILBIE | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|||||
SUE HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ruth Riley | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.83k | £14.32k | £12.52k | £10.03k | £4.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.65k | £13.59k | £8.64k | £9.57k | £13.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2024 | 317 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 December 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2020 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 4 FEBRUARY 1983
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE, IN MOMORY OF THE DEAD OF THE TWO WORLS WARS A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SANDICARE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OFPOLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, UNCLIDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREARION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE CONDISTION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (2) SAID LAND AND BUILDING SHALL BE HELD ON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL AND EXISTING MEMORIAL TABLETS TO BE PRESERVED AND DISPLAYED THEREIN.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF SADICARE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Derby Road
Sandiacre
Nottingham
Nottinghamshire
NG10 5HU
- Phone:
- 07517489282
- Email:
- RUTH_RILEY@MSN.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window