YORK CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold regualr sunday service and various bible reading group for Chinese speaking people in York to help them grow in Christian faith. We also organize various parties, retreats and day trips to spread the good news among Chinese community in York.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- City Of York
Governance
- 29 May 2019: Standard registration
- YCCC (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEI WANG | Chair | 06 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Crosby | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chih Leung Wong | Trustee | 06 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prof. ZAIFU YANG | Trustee | 06 May 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.85k | £4.75k | £11.35k | £16.56k | £19.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.38k | £4.06k | £12.91k | £6.93k | £7.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCE OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A FREE CHINESE LANGUAGE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O CORNERSTONE
Millfield Lane
York
YO10 3AP
- Phone:
- 01904870775
- Email:
- yorkccc2012@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window