NEW HEDGES VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR ORGANISATIONS THROUGHOUT THE COMMUNITY TO HOLD THEIR FUNCTIONS , ARTS AND CRAFTS, YOGA, BOWLING, CONCERTS AND PARTIES ETC. WE PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR YOUNG, OLD AND DISABLED PEOPLE, KITCHEN FACILITIES AND TOILETS FOR THE DISABLED. THESE FACILITIES ARE AVAILABLE ALL YEAR ROUND.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £3,495 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 18 July 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Morgan | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD RAWSON-HUMPHRIES | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.61k | £17.32k | £18.54k | £12.29k | £24.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.93k | £14.24k | £12.09k | £16.69k | £27.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £13.00k | N/A | £3.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 August 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 230 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 04 August 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 SEPTEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ST. MARY-OUT-LIBERTY IN THE COUNTY OF DYFED WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST MARY-OUT-LIBERTY IN THE COUNTY OF DYFED
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Hedges Village Hall
New Hedges
TENBY
Dyfed
SA70 8TN
- Phone:
- 07493 610200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window