PH7 LIFE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PH7 LIFE are a mental health charity that use innovative and traditional methods to fight mental illness. We educate, inquire and inspire people to lead happier, healthier lives. We predominantly work, but are not limited to the North West of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021
Total income includes £9,994 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- PH7 Wellbeing (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.57k | £34.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.08k | £15.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.53k | £9.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS RESIDING IN, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND WHO ARE SUFFERING, BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window