ALS PALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising Support to cancer patients emotionally and practically in hospital, at home, online and in the community Telephone support Advocacy Signposting Gifts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
- Milton Keynes
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 20 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Antony Smith | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darren Smallridge | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Whitton | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Dumbell | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.62k | £12.32k | £30.73k | £57.39k | £79.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.99k | £6.05k | £28.19k | £65.31k | £66.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.62k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jun 2019 as amended on 21 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
For the public benefit to relieve the needs of people affected by cancer and their families/carers in the Milton Keynes, Northamptonshire, Bedfordshire, Buckinghamshire and Hertfordshire areas by providing support, assistance and information.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Silver Street
Stony Stratford
MILTON KEYNES
MK111JR
- Phone:
- 07958800081
- Email:
- info@alspals.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window