THE BILLINGTON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our foundation believes that family is the bedrock of communities and of healthy society. We believe that giving children and young people a good start is the most effective way to improve our society. The foundation will award grants to the relief of poverty, education, the furthering of interests of and improving the lives of children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsey Anne Broadbent | Chair | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Alleyn Bunting | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Julie Ann Greenwood | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £284.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £114.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS BY MAKING OF GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BILLINGTON FOUNDATION
CUNARD BUILDING
WATER STREET
Cunard Building
L3 1EL
- Phone:
- 01512439010
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window