Sporting Wellness

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sporting Wellness provides professional mental health support to representative sportspeople over the age of 16, across all sports. We also raise awareness of the importance of positive mental health in sport via our events, digital channels, partnerships and the ambassador athletes we work with.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 November 2019: CIO registration
- SPORTING MINDS UK (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Palmer | Chair | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Michelle Smeed | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Middleton | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Antony Lea | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.14k | £86.83k | £77.57k | £98.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.18k | £80.52k | £84.26k | £82.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 26 NOV 2019 AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 2021 AMENDED ON 19 NOV 2021 as amended on 31 May 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SPORTSPEOPLE WHO ARE CURRENTLY OR HAVE BEEN ACTIVE IN COMPETITIVE SPORT AND AS A RESULT OF COMPETITIVE PRESSURE IN THEIR CHOSEN SPORTS ARE AT RISK OF EXPERIENCING OR ARE EXPERIENCING POOR MENTAL HEALTH BY: -RAISING AWARENESS WITH SUCH PEOPLE, THE COMPETITIVE SPORTS COMMUNITY AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF POSITIVE MENTAL HEALTH AND MENTAL HEALTH SYMPTOMS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL MEDIA CAMPAIGNS, PRESENTATIONS AND MENTAL HEALTH TRAINING AT SPORTS CLUBS -PROVIDING GRANT FUNDING TO ENABLE SPORTS PEOPLE AT RISK TO ACCESS THERAPY
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 The Appleyard
Brewood
STAFFORD
ST19 9EN
- Phone:
- 03333355994
- Email:
- hello@sportingwellness.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window