ERASE MESO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Erase Meso is a charity that 1. Raises funds for scientific research aimed at finding a cure for Mesothelioma 2. Advances education and awareness of the general public in all areas relating to Mesothelioma
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Adrian Cook | Chair | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Francis Bath | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Alexander O'Neil | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.26k | £31.63k | £65.67k | £19.02k | £5.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.33k | £2.13k | £3.09k | £1.79k | £39.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 April 2021 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 April 2021 | 159 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF EXISTING AND FUTURE SUFFERERS OF MESOTHELIOMA THROUGHOUT THE WORLD THROUGH: (1) PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH AIMED AT FINDING A CURE FOR MESOTHELIOMA AND/OR CONTROLLING THE NON FINANCIAL IMPACT OF THE DISEASE ON EXISTING AND FUTURE SUFFERERS; (2) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO MESOTHELIOMA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 WEST PARK
LONDON
SE9 4RY
- Phone:
- 07901613393
- Email:
- richard@erasemeso.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window