Financial history SCARBOROUGH MATES

Charity number: 1184005
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/03/2020 01/03/2021 01/03/2022 01/03/2023 01/03/2024
Total gross income £2.69k £3.92k £26.62k £53.29k £25.00k
Total expenditure £4.01k £2.62k £21.71k £37.07k £19.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £750 £939 N/A £500