SCARBOROUGH MATES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scarborough MATES promotes social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing adults over 18 years of age, in Scarborough from becoming socially excluded, assisting them to integrate into society through the provision of facilities in which they can meet jointly or individually to undertake creative, physical or recreational activities in safe and socially inclusive surroundings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
31 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Porter BEM,MCIoF | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Brian Mulvana | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Louise Sutton | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Mathers | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Woodroffe MBCHB | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Ferguson | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.69k | £3.92k | £26.62k | £53.29k | £25.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.01k | £2.62k | £21.71k | £37.07k | £19.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £750 | £939 | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | 03 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING ADULTS OVER 18 YEARS OF AGE, IN SCARBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET JOINTLY OR INDIVIDUALLY TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; SOCIAL ISOLATION, YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL).
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scarborough Mates
Unit 8
66 Londesborough Road
SCARBOROUGH
North Yorkshire
YO12 5AF
- Phone:
- 01723353448
- Email:
- scarboroughmates@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window