Beulah International Church of Apostles (C&S)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing Christain religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 September 2019: CIO registration
- BEULAH INTERNATIONAL CHURCH OF APOSTLE C&S (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olaropo Dauda Adegbenga Oladeji | Chair | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Solomon Kehinde Abioye | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
JULIANAH OLUWAYEMISI OLU | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
OMOWUNMI AJOKE SULAIMAN | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.18k | £36.35k | £34.39k | £31.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.40k | £40.36k | £37.04k | £36.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Sep 2019 as amended on 29 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTAIN RELIGION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT ACCORDING TO THE STATEMENT OF FAITH OF CHURCH AND IN PARTICLUAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY HOLDING PRAYER MEETINGS, CHRISTAIN WORSHIP SERVICES, PROVIDING AND DISTRIBUTING INFORMATION ON CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN OTHER TO ENLIGHTEN THE PUBLIC ON CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND BRING THEM TO THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLOCK H ARCH 7
61-65 PAULET ROAD
CAMBERWELL
LONDON
SE5 9HW
- Phone:
- 07405602107
- Email:
- bicap.christ@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window