Trustees NORTHWOOD DAY CARE CENTRE
Charity Number: 514092
Up to date (52 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mandy Machin | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|||||
June Sheldon | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Anthony Thomas | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Douglas Howell | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Mitchell | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Walton | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Susan Rogers | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ASHWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WINNIE WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
||||||
EUNICE WALTON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.