Trustees AFRICAN BIRD CLUB
Charity Number: 1184309

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wesley Paul | Chair | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Talatu Tende | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PETER BLAIR | Trustee | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Florence Carissan | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Berridge | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abubakr Mohammad | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Francis | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mercy Kariuki | Trustee | 23 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Elisabeth Squier | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Buckley | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.