LOWRY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Indoor/Outdoor activity,Training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
Total income includes £34,126 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Salford City
Governance
- 03 August 1983: Standard registration
- 30 March 2022: Funds received from 1029172 12TH SWINTON SCOUT GROUP
- LOWRY SCOUT DISTRICT (Previous name)
- SALFORD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL WILSON | Chair | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Grech | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke Turner | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharmila Christine Clarke | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Samson | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANN SALT | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Swailes | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|||||
JUSTIN MCDONNELL | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.39k | £19.22k | £39.14k | £42.35k | £92.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.76k | £2.38k | £45.36k | £25.91k | £104.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.97k | £15.00k | N/A | £34.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER- 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTIONS OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 Park Lane
SALFORD
M6 7RQ
- Phone:
- 07834836758
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window