THE YINKA SHONIBARE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The support of international creative exchanges, the development of new work, the mutual understanding of cultural differences and breaking down traditional barriers of access, lack of infrastructure and education. Actively supporting transdisciplinary artists, researchers and practitioner residencies within the arts, design and agriculture; education and public events in the UK and Nigeria.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £17,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Nigeria
Governance
- 08 May 2019: CIO registration
- Yinka Shonibare Foundation (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rahman Yinka Shonibare | Chair | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tiwalade Akinlemibola | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Marie Pena | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Fishbone | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oba Eric Nsugbe | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adebimpe Nkontchou | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.49k | £393.14k | £160.99k | £166.10k | £376.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.49k | £131.43k | £204.05k | £227.15k | £360.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 February 2021 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 February 2021 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 May 2019 as amended on 28 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
For the public benefit, to promote, educate, maintain and improve the arts and culture, particularly but not exclusively in the UK and Nigeria by: i. Supporting the establishment and programme of "Guest Artists Space Foundation" in Nigeria and the continuing work of "Guest Projects London" by providing facilities and support (to African, African diaspora and international artists, researchers, scholars, and other creative individuals), in the research and development of their skills in the Liberal and Fine Arts, Creative Industries, Environment and Agriculture fields of study and practice. ii. Encouraging cultural exchange and deeper knowledge between Africa and the rest of the world to promote mutual understanding of cultural differences through developing exchange programmes, hosting exhibitions, talks, workshops, events and performances and collaborating with cultural institutions in Nigeria, Africa and the rest of the world.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUNBURY HOUSE
1 ANDREWS ROAD
LONDON
E8 4QL
- Phone:
- 02072491409
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window