HALLMARK CARE HOMES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hallmark Care Homes Foundation invests in the future of care so everyone can age well. The foundation provides grants to charities, researchers, innovators and partnerships to support and develop the care workforce, improve the quality of care, and make care more sustainable and accessible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 January 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neha Goyal | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirstie McMillan | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Cockell | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Whatford CBE | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Rayner | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
VIDYA GOYAL | Trustee | 09 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sangita Goyal | Trustee | 09 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
AVNISH GOYAL CBE | Trustee | 09 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Anita Goyal MBE | Trustee | 09 February 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £367.70k | £188.22k | £385.00k | £259.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £351.77k | £189.58k | £386.10k | £261.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE CARING FOR OR NURSING OTHERS AND THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO ARE CHRONICALLY SICK OR DISABLED BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND ADVICE FOR THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR THEIR CARE. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE WHO CARE FOR OTHERS, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO ADVANCE HEALTH OR FOR THE PURPOSE OF SAVING LIVES, MAKE GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDE SERVICES TO THOSE ORGANISATIONS THAT CONDUCT MEDICAL RESEARCH. TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hallmark Care Homes
2 Kingfisher House Radford Way
BILLERICAY
CM12 0EQ
- Phone:
- 01277655655
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window