AVON NEEDS TREES

Charity number: 1184386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Avon Needs Trees is acquiring suitable land in the Bristol-Avon Catchment Area to create new, permanent forest through reforesting and rewilding. We aim to lock up carbon, improve biodiversity, mitigate flooding through natural means and to create opportunities for the public to engage with nature. Our first purchase was 34 acres at Hazeland near Calne, where we have planted over 10,000 trees.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Bristol City
  • North Somerset
  • Somerset
  • South Gloucestershire
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 July 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Funnell Chair 23 May 2022
None on record
Theo Blanchard Trustee 28 November 2022
None on record
Stuart Hales Trustee 24 January 2022
None on record
Andrew Chester Trustee 23 July 2020
None on record
Catherine Lucy Bedford Trustee 22 June 2020
None on record
John Chew Trustee 16 February 2020
None on record
Anthony Gavin Spittlehouse Trustee 04 December 2019
None on record
Dr Nicholas John Art Murry Trustee 26 April 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/07/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £516.99k £335.12k £219.71k £765.19k
Total expenditure £8.00k £77.90k £169.56k £311.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.18k £99.83k £681.68k
Income - Donations and legacies £276.77k N/A N/A £764.36k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £240.20k N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £19 N/A N/A £827
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.09k N/A N/A £100.56k
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.91k N/A N/A £109
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £1.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £210.60k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 11/07/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Own use assets £0 N/A N/A £972.07k
Long-term investments £0 N/A N/A £0
Other assets £509.00k N/A N/A £303.13k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities £0 N/A N/A £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Annual return not yet received
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 30 June 2023 08 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 08 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 27 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 09 May 2022 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 11 July 2020 01 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 July 2020 01 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Avon Needs Trees
Canningford House
38 Victoria Street
BRISTOL
BS1 6BY
Phone:
0117 945 8730