Accounts and annual returns BOSH; BRISTOL OUTREACH SERVICES FOR THE HOMELESS

Charity number: 1187833
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 February 2024
Accounts and TAR 19 February 2024
Annual return 19 February 2023
Accounts and TAR 19 February 2023
Annual return 19 February 2022
Accounts and TAR 19 February 2022
Annual return 19 February 2021 15 March 2024 817 days late
Accounts and TAR 19 February 2021 19 March 2024 821 days late Download Open in new window