BOSH; BRISTOL OUTREACH SERVICES FOR THE HOMELESS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of persons, who are in need, by virtue of being homeless or rough sleepers in Bristol, through the provision of support, advocacy and basic necessities for survival
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 February 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 10 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Dempster | Chair | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Durrant | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr June Carson | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/02/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 February 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 19 February 2024 | |||
Annual return | 19 February 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 19 February 2023 | |||
Annual return | 19 February 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 19 February 2022 | |||
Annual return | 19 February 2021 | 15 March 2024 | 817 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 February 2021 | 19 March 2024 | 821 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF BEING HOMELESS OR ROUGH SLEEPERS IN BRISTOL, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVOCACY AND BASIC NECESSITIES FOR SURVIVAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
64
Bond Street
Bristol
Avon
BS1 3LZ
- Phone:
- 01174520378
- Email:
- boshoutreach@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window