NATIONAL ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF WALES

Charity number: 514108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Owning and managing Zoological Gardens providing education and conservation benefits. Involvement in and/or management of in-situ and ex-situ projects in Wales and abroad. Providing education services. Providing training and relevant work experience opportunities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Conwy
  • Denbighshire
  • Flintshire
  • Gwynedd

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 July 1983: Standard registration
  • 02 January 2024: Funds received from 507970 THE ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF WALES ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • TRADES AS THE WELSH MOUNTAIN ZOO (Working name)
  • WELSH MOUNTAIN ZOO (Working name)
  • ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF WALES (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Jackson Chair 04 March 2014
None on record
Ashley Rogers Trustee 14 June 2022
None on record
Nicholas Jackson Trustee 14 June 2022
None on record
Andrew Greenwood Trustee 21 April 2020
None on record
Susan Belton Trustee 11 June 2019
None on record
PETER GIBSON Trustee
None on record
Dr CAROLINE HARCOURT Trustee
None on record
TERRY DEAKIN Trustee
None on record
NIGEL HOWARD BROWN BSC Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.14m £2.38m £2.85m £2.59m £2.62m
Total expenditure £1.95m £1.67m £2.08m £2.50m £2.56m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £461.11k £120.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £167.18k £1.02m £323.06k £72.17k £221.85k
Income - Other trading activities £248.39k £186.16k £375.76k £387.49k £344.84k
Income - Charitable activities £1.59m £998.32k £1.94m £1.96m £1.91m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £49.14k £42.94k £61.92k £56.00k £61.33k
Income - Other £85.74k £129.17k £145.60k £112.83k £75.51k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £85.95k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.72m £1.50m £1.79m £2.13m £2.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds £49.62k £20.73k £27.88k £42.33k £46.30k
Expenditure - Governance £6.00k £7.30k £0 £6.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £176.78k £154.20k £263.78k £329.64k £242.75k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £1.88m £2.86m £3.01m £3.63m £3.57m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.72m £1.77m £2.29m £1.64m £1.78m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £147.40k £481.37k £383.64k £255.14k £270.90k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 13 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Mr Chris Mitchell
WELSH MOUNTAIN ZOO
OLD HIGHWAY
COLWYN BAY
CONWY
LL28 5UY
Phone:
01492532938