WHITBY WILDLIFE SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To rescue, treat, rehabilitate and release wildlife, in response to calls from the public, veterinary practices and other wildlife rescue centres. To provide sanctuary space for animals that can still live a good quality of life, ensuring our facilities meet the five freedoms. To educate the public and raise awareness in wildlife welfare issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
207 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 September 2019: CIO registration
- 01 December 2019: Funds received from 1165589 WHITBY WILDLIFE SANCTUARY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laurie Farmer | Chair | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carole Hardwick | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER LAW | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sam Taylor | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Smith | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE LAW | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.00k | £214.64k | £167.00k | £207.00k | £229.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £230.00k | £229.73k | £160.00k | £174.00k | £226.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 January 2022 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 January 2022 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF WILDLIFE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH WILDLIFE TO ENABLE REHABILITATION AND RELEASE BACK INTO THE WILD. 2. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS WILDLIFE BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR WILDLIFE WHICH IS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF INJURY, SICKNESS, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO WILDLIFE WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING OF WILDLIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITBY WILDLIFE SANCTUARY
Broomfield Farm
Stainsacre Lane
WHITBY
YO22 4NW
- Phone:
- 07342173724
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window