ENFIELD TOWN SCHOOLS' PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of children and young people in Enfield, North London, through the provision of services, facilities and activities and to meet the social and emotional well-being needs of all the pupils within our care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Enfield
Governance
- 11 November 2019: CIO registration
- ETSP (Working name)
- THE PARTNERSHIP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Julia Ballantine | Chair | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maftuna Bakhodirova | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lynda Mehmet | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Paul Phillips | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Dawn Cassius | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Johannes Manuel Martinus Maria Bless | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.42k | £79.69k | £76.70k | £131.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.83k | £36.62k | £73.43k | £107.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ENFIELD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: I. DEVELOPING COLLABORATION BETWEEN SCHOOLS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL BODIES AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY IN WHICH THEY OPERATE, PROMOTING POSITIVE COMMUNITY ENGAGEMENT IN SCHOOLS AND WITH FAMILIES. II. PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR DISADVANTAGED PUPILS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF PARENTS AND CARERS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO ENABLE THEM TO ENGAGE MORE WITH THE EDUCATION OF, AND TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THE NEEDS OF, THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THEIR CARE. III. THE PROVISION OF TRAINING TO INDIVIDUALS INVOLVED IN THE EDUCATION AND PASTORAL CARE OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ORDER TO EQUIP THEM WITH THE SKILLS REQUIRED TO DELIVER SUCH EDUCATION AND TO SUPPORT THE SOCIAL AND EMOTIONAL WELL-BEING OF THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THEIR CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carterhatch Infant School
Carterhatch Lane
ENFIELD
Middlesex
EN1 4JY
- Phone:
- 02088046886
- Email:
- info@etsplondon.org
- Website:
-
etsplondon.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window