WICK AND MONKNASH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are responsible for the smooth running of the Village Hall, and the activities that take place therein.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 18 July 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARJ DIXON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Charlotte Thomas | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Amy Angharad Thomas | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robbie Norris | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jan Purcell | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Ritchings | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ball | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.25k | £1.86k | £7.92k | £10.68k | £10.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.13k | £3.92k | £7.20k | £8.07k | £9.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 01/10/1934 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF PHYSICAL AND MENTA RECREATION AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, CLASSES, RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CIVIL PARISHES OF WICK AND MONKNASH IN THE COUNTY OF GLAMORGAN.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF WICK AND MONKNASH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mill Lodge
Windmill Close
Wick
Cowbridge
CF71 7QU
- Phone:
- 01656890006
- Email:
- aeritchings@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window