AUTISM PARENTS TOGETHER (TEES VALLEY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides education, information and opportunities designed to support and enable autistic children to maximise their potential. We also providing support groups, forums, advice, advocacy and general support for autistic children and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 20 May 2019: CIO registration
- AUTISM PARENTS TOGETHER (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eloise Fleming | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANITA REEVES | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Elizabeth Cherrett | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marie Terese Johnson | Trustee | 01 May 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.24k | £40.46k | £61.55k | £78.84k | £53.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.43k | £36.10k | £60.36k | £83.99k | £72.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG CHILDREN AGED 0 - 18 IN TEES VALLEY WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF AUTISM AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EDUCATION, INFORMATION AND OPPORTUNITIES DESIGNED TO SUPPORT AND ENABLE AUTISTIC CHILDREN TO MAXIMISE THEIR POTENTIAL; B) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING AUTISTIC CHILDREN, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION; C) PROVIDING SUPPORT GROUPS, FORUMS, ADVICE, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT FOR AUTISTIC CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES/CARERS. D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR AUTISTIC CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES/CARERS PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Acklam Hall
Office 15
Hall Drive
Acklam
Middlesbrough
TS5 7DY
- Phone:
- 07721073358
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window