CHRIST TEMPLE PRAYER MINISTRY (CTPM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Evangelism
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 06 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nguikuludo Mavambu | Chair | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joaquina Augusta Oliveira | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mayamba Daniel | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nzali Nkoy | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.20k | £0 | £2.30k | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.67k | £0 | £2.20k | £1.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 10 August 2024 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 23 January 2025 | 359 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 27 September 2023 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 23 January 2025 | 724 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 16 June 2023 | 502 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 16 June 2023 | 502 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, ENGLAND AND WALES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP AND PRAYERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trafford Services Ltd
Lancaster Works
Kingsbridge Road
MANCHESTER
M9 5SP
- Phone:
- 07394562706
- Email:
- NGUIKULUDO123@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window