THE ARCH MONEY ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 1187797
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The relief of poverty or financial hardship, in particular but not exclusively by providing a range of impartial money advice and support services to people in financial hardship, including those in debt.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 May 2022

Total income: £165
Total expenditure: £165

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 February 2020: CIO registration
  • 05 March 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 05 March 2025: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE MONEY ARCH ADVICE CENTRE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/05/2021 01/05/2022
Total gross income £0 £165
Total expenditure £200 £165
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 63 days
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 63 days
Annual return 01 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 428 days
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 428 days
Annual return 01 May 2022 12 May 2023 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 794 days
Annual return 01 May 2021 31 March 2022 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2021 31 March 2022 30 days late
Submit annual return Open in new window