Family2Family

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND ASSOCIATED ADVERSITY IN EAST SUSSEX AND SURROUNDING AREAS THROUGH PROVISION OF CLOTHING AND ESSENTIAL ITEMS FOR BABIES AND CHILDREN TO FAMILIES IN NEED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 September 2019: CIO registration
- BABY2BABY &BEYOND (Working name)
- BABY2BABY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Oversby-Powell | Chair | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Lewis | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leila Parker | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Morris | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/05/2020 | 15/05/2021 | 15/05/2022 | 15/05/2023 | 15/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.85k | £29.39k | £21.33k | £31.63k | £92.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.94k | £27.81k | £21.67k | £15.84k | £55.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 May 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 May 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 May 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 May 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 May 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Sep 2019 as amended on 04 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND ASSOCIATED ADVERSITY IN EAST SUSSEX AND SURROUNDING AREAS THROUGH PROVISION OF CLOTHING AND ESSENTIAL ITEMS FOR BABIES AND CHILDREN TO FAMILIES IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crowborough Childrens Centre
Green Lane
CROWBOROUGH
East Sussex
TN6 2XB
- Phone:
- 07496439009
- Email:
- hello@family2family.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window