OUTREACH 4 WOLVERHAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is for the public benefit the relief of poverty amongst those who are homeless or rough sleepers in Wolverhampton and surrounding areas who are in need, hardship and distress on account of their social and economic circumstances, in particular but not exclusively by the provision of clothing, bedding, food and drinks, helping assist in the provision of temporary accommodation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 31 July 2019: CIO registration
- O4W (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phillip Neil Amison | Chair | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Hatton M.Soc.Sci | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Mulligan | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven Pascall | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maria Meageen | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Celeste Lochhead | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.98k | £6.10k | £1.06k | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.71k | £1.40k | £794 | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.09k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 May 2025 | 376 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 11 May 2025 | 376 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 July 2023 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 July 2023 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2022 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2022 | 363 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THOSE WHO ARE HOMELESS OR ROUGH SLEEPERS IN WOLVERHAMPTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS ON ACCOUNT OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF CLOTHING, BEDDING, FOOD AND DRINKS, HELPING ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SIGNPOSTING ON ISSUES RELATED TO HEALTHCARE, ADDICTION AND HOUSING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 6 Ingleby Gardens
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV6 0TH
- Phone:
- 07970596795
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window