THE FRIENDS OF BARNDALE HOUSE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for Education Establishment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northumberland
Governance
- 15 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Muir | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £819 | £658 | £500 | £1.60k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £982 | £0 | £0 | £7 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 07 February 2025 | 369 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 07 February 2025 | 369 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 08 February 2023 | 369 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1184 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 08 February 2023 | 734 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1549 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT BARNDALE SCHOOL AND ITS PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barndale House
Howling Lane
ALNWICK
Northumberland
NE66 1DQ
- Phone:
- 01665602541
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window