EMMA'S EMBRACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting and protecting the good mental health of young people, particularly students aged 16 to 25 in such ways as shall be thought fit in particular but not exclusively by: Conducting & commissioning research into all aspects of anxiety in young people and disseminating the results. Providing a weekly drop in for students. Working with other organisations to promote good mental health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Leeds City
Governance
- 26 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Theresa Kirk | Chair | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jay | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
PENNY CARTER | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laura Ward | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Holly Alexandra McDermott | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Kirk | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Hobson | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Marsh | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Bilsborough | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.55k | £8.77k | £30.03k | £8.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.62k | £16.06k | £27.41k | £19.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 May 2024 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 May 2024 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
1. UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO THE HOW YOUNG PEOPLE ACCESS AVAILABLE SUPPORT, WHAT SERVICES THEY NEED TO ADVANCE THROUGH LIFE AND WHAT CURRENT SERVICES PROVIDE 2. INFLUENCING POLICY MAKERS TO ENSURE THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH INFORMATION ON THE WAYS TO MAINTAIN POSITIVE MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH SOCIAL MEDIA AND OTHER MEANS 3. INFLUENCING POLICY MAKERS TO LISTEN TO THE VIEWS OF YOUNG PEOPLE TO ENSURE SERVICES ARE APPROPRIATE, EFFECTIVE AND TIMELY 4. WORKING WITH OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS TO MAXIMISE RESOURCES TO PROMOTE POSITIVE MENTAL HEALTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 MALVERN MEWS
WAKEFIELD
WF1 2FD
- Phone:
- 07917426983
- Email:
- Emmasembrace@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window