Accounts and annual returns MEDICAL EXPEDITIONS

Charity number: 1187187
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 27 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 27 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window