Financial history MEDICAL EXPEDITIONS

Charity number: 1187187
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £13.83k £0 £0 £0 £3
Total expenditure £0 £87 £80 £74 £89
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A