KOTATSU JAPANESE ANIMATION FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kotatsu Japanese Animation Festival, founded in 2010 is an annual festival presenting and celebrating the best of Japan's distinctive anime independent short films and mainstream feature films as well as educational workshops for children and people of all ages. Activities are normally held at two of Wales' leading arts venues, in Cardiff and Aberystwyth, while some may be hosted online.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 10 January 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Hugh Rive | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Mary Johanna Owen-Burns | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Lyons | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.61k | £21.45k | £12.43k | £6.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.40k | £15.18k | £17.63k | £14.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 07 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ART AND CULTURE OF JAPAN BY HOLDING A FESTIVAL OF JAPANESE ANIMATED FILMS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 CORONATION STREET
TRETHOMAS
CAERPHILLY
CF83 8DL
- Phone:
- 07597929989
- Email:
- info@kotatsufestival.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window