REESTABLISH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with young people aged 7 to 19 years, surrounded by drugs, crime, violence and loss from areas of high deprivation, within Leeds - based in Beeston & Holbeck, South Leeds. We provide activities and support for young people and their broader families, running weekly, drop-in's, mentoring and group sessions, that enable those involved to holistically grow, have fun and belong.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £56,221 from 6 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 09 January 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Latz | Chair | 15 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Sunderland | Trustee | 26 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Faye Vollans | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Pedley | Trustee | 23 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.11k | £178.45k | £196.26k | £336.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.86k | £132.34k | £186.92k | £224.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.55k | £5.00k | £58.08k | £56.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 TO SUPPORT AND HELP CHILDREN, YOUNG ADULTS AND THEIR FAMILIES LIVING IN LEEDS AND THE UNITED KINGDOM, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP, ARE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED OR AT RISK OF EXCLUSION FROM SOCIETY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE AND PRODUCTIVE ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: 3.1.1 ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS 3.1.2 ADVANCING EDUCATION 3.1.3 PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF THE HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, HARDSHIP, ARE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED OR AT RISK OF EXCLUSION FROM SOCIETY WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR STANDARD AND CONDITION OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Reestablish
Hillside
Beeston Road
Leeds
LS11 8ND
- Phone:
- 07828201330
- Email:
- reestablish.info@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window