CALDERDALE LIGHTHOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a 100% volunteer run Charity based in Halifax. We distribute equipment and other essential items to vulnerable and disadvantaged families throughout Calderdale and surrounding areas. The majority of our items are donated by the general public. Our service is free to use and accessed through a third party referral system.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
Governance
- 10 July 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe Halliday-Wilson | Chair | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Keyes | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Poyser-Buxton | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Williams | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Donna Louise Williams | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Diane Barker | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarann Mahmood | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.20k | £33.44k | £16.92k | £36.42k | £27.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.12k | £17.87k | £19.53k | £26.60k | £34.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 OCT 2018 AS AMENDED ON 03 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF FAMILIES WITH CHILDREN THROUGHOUT CALDERDALE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN NEED BY PROVIDING ITEMS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO CHILDREN'S CLOTHING, TOYS AND BABY EQUIPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT F
EMPIRE HOUSE
11 MULCTURE HALL ROAD
HALIFAX
HX1 1SP
- Phone:
- 01422241458
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window