FSA LONG BENNINGTON ACADEMY

Charity Number: 1183249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We're made up of a fantastic group of parents, carers, school staff and community members who constantly look for fun and exciting ways to help raise additional funds for our school. We've been an integral part of the Long Bennington community for years, raising thousands of pounds to be spent on equipment and resource our children's education, facilities and the school experience.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £12,895
Total expenditure: £22,889

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 May 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura O'Reilly Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Gemma Atkinson Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Laura Jane King Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.07k £4.87k £11.65k £12.90k
Total expenditure £10.42k £5.13k £47 £22.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Long Bennington C of E Academy
Main Road
Long Bennington
NEWARK
NG23 5EH
Phone:
01400281353
Website:

No information available